This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2020 at 22:35:38 (UTC).

ABEER SADDUQ VS MAHFOUZ M MICHAEL M D INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 ABEER SADDUQ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MAHFOUZ M MICHAEL M D INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9525

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SADDUQ ABEER

Defendants and Respondents

MAHFOUZ MICHAEL M.

CLINICA MEDICA SAN MIGUEL

DOES 1-25

CLINICA MEDICA SAN MIGUEL I.P.A. MEDICAL

MAHFOUZ M. MICHAEL M.D. INC.

MAHFOUZ M. MICHAEL M.D. INC. DBA CLINICA MEDICA SAN MIGUEL

CLINICA MEDICA SAN MIGUEL I.P.A. MEDICAL GROUP

Not Classified By Court

CONCEPCION WESLEY

GOSHGARIAN & ASSOCIATES

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AMES SCOTT R. ESQ.

AMES SCOTT ROBERT ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GOSHGARIAN MARK ESQ.

GOSHGARIAN MARK GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

10/9/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

11/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

Case Management Statement

12/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

12/13/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

12/17/2019: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

12/17/2019: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order -

8/3/2018: Minute Order -

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/3/2018: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

8/24/2018: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

Minute Order -

8/29/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/9/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

11/29/2018: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/18/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/18/2018: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Hearing02/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Hearing08/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (striking the answers of Clinica Medica San Miguel, and Mahfouz M. Michael M.D., Inc. for failure to retain counsel) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: striking ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Default and Notice of Setting Trial and Final Status Conference Dates at Case Management Conference); Filed by Abeer Sadduq (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Abeer Sadduq (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ABEER SADDUQ'S NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 170.6 AND DECLARATION OF ERIN M. KELLY IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Abeer Sadduq (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abeer Sadduq (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699525    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 74

BC699525 ABEER SADDUQ VS MAHFOUZ M MICHAEL M D INC ET AL

Mark Goshgarian/Goshgarian Associates PLC’s Unopposed Motions to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendants Michael M. Mahfouz, Clinica Medica San Miguel, and Mahfouz M. Michael M.D., Inc.

TENTATIVE RULINGS: The motions are GRANTED and counsel is relieved as of service of the orders on defendants. Today’s Case Management Conference is continued to February 4, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The court sets an OSC re striking the answers of Clinica Medica San Miguel, and Mahfouz M. Michael M.D., Inc. for failure to retain counsel on February 4, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.