This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 02:51:27 (UTC).

ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER, INC. VS EANG SAMNIENGTHAI

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EANG SAMNIENGTHAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0154

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC.

Defendant

SAMNIENGTHAI EANG DBA THAI SAMNIENG JEWELRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSSMAN LESLIE K.

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/16/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT EANG SAMNIENGTHAI DBA THAI SAMNIENG JEWELRY

10/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT EANG SAMNIENGTHAI DBA THAI SAMNIENG JEWELRY

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10

10/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 10

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/12/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/12/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Statement of the Case

10/12/2021: Statement of the Case

Default Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT

10/13/2021: Default Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/23/2021

8/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/23/2021

Case Management Statement

8/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - EANG SAMNIENTHAI DBA THAI SARNNIENG JEWELRY

6/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - EANG SAMNIENTHAI DBA THAI SARNNIENG JEWELRY

Proof of Service by Mail

5/27/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Imposed Against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Attorney for Failure to Bring Case to Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummary of The Case in Support of Plaintiff Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc.'s Application for Entry of Default Judgment [C.R.C, Rule 3.1800]; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment as to Defendant Eang Samniengthai dba Thai Samnieng Jewelry; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Abe Abrahamoff in Support of Plaintiff Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc.'s Application for Entry of Default Judgment; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Does 1 to 10); Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (as to Eang Samnienthai dba Thai Sarnnieng Jewelry); Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN LESLIE KENNETH