This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 15:02:04 (UTC).

ABDULHAKIM HASSEN VS CHLOE'S APARTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 ABDULHAKIM HASSEN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CHLOE'S APARTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHANIE M. BOWICK and MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9130

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASSEN ABDULHAKIM

Defendants

CHLOE'S APARTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

APARTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

ZUCKERMAN DAN

WILLIAMS TRUST

MALIN ADRIAN

WILLIAMS GAYLORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

MICHELS NATHANIEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

8/17/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RULING ON DEFENDANTS ELOISE C....)

8/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RULING ON DEFENDANTS ELOISE C....)

Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

8/12/2022: Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS ELOISE C. WILLIAMS (TRUSTEE OF THE...)

8/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS ELOISE C. WILLIAMS (TRUSTEE OF THE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS ELOISE C. WILLIAMS (TRUSTEE OF THE...) OF 08/12/2022

8/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS ELOISE C. WILLIAMS (TRUSTEE OF THE...) OF 08/12/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER (PROPOSED) GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT]

8/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER (PROPOSED) GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/02/2022

8/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/02/2022

8/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/02/2022

Notice of Related Case

7/12/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Mail

5/9/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

5/9/2022: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Notice of Settlement

5/9/2022: Notice of Settlement

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

5/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/28/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

10/15/2021: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • Hearing07/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Eloise C. Williams, trustee of the Williams Trust (DOE 4) Erroneously Sued As Williams Trust (Defendant); Gaylord Williams (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Abdulhakim Hassen on 10/13/2020, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to Williams Trust and Gaylord Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order (Proposed) Granting Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketOrder (Proposed) Granting Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Signed and Filed by: Eloise C. Williams, trustee of the Williams Trust (DOE 4) Erroneously Sued As Williams Trust (Defendant); Gaylord Williams (Defendant); As to: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order (Proposed) Granting Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement: Filed By: Eloise C. Williams, trustee of the Williams Trust (DOE 4) Erroneously Sued As Williams Trust (Defendant),Gaylord Williams (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Ruling on DEFENDANTS ELOISE C....)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Ruling on DEFENDANTS ELOISE C. WILLIAMS AND GAYLORD WILLIAMS APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (filed on 05/09/22) scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAddress for Daniel Lavi (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff); As to: Chloe's Apartments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff); As to: Chloe's Apartments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff); As to: Chloe's Apartments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff); As to: Chloe's Apartments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Abdulhakim Hassen (Plaintiff); As to: Chloe's Apartments, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less