This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 12:23:00 (UTC).

ABBY MCMULLAN VS THE KROGER CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 ABBY MCMULLAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against THE KROGER CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2838

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCMULLAN ABBY

Defendants

C.D. PHARM. D.

RALPH'S

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUSAVICH BRUCE M.

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/18/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/23/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/17/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

7/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/9/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Gregory Edward Stone (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Abby McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alpha Beta Company dba Ralphs Erroneously Sued As Ralph's (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abby McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abby McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Abby McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abby McMullan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUSAVICH BRUCE M. ESQ.