Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 09:55:23 (UTC).

ABBEY ROE VS ALAMO RENTAL CAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 ABBEY ROE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALAMO RENTAL CAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1753

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROE ABBEY

Defendants

ALAMO RENTAL CAR

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

GEMMA GOMEZ FERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREITER BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/17/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Hearing12/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Abbey Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Abbey Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Abbey Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Abbey Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abbey Roe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMO RENTAL (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant