This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2023 at 18:58:27 (UTC).

ABARGIL, JOSEPH VS ABARGIL, LIAT SHENHAV

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ABARGIL, JOSEPH filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against ABARGIL, LIAT SHENHAV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABARGIL JOSEPH

Respondent

ABARGIL LIAT SHENHAV

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BIER KURT

 

Court Documents

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law

1/21/2021: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law

Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities

1/21/2021: Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities

Notice - of Application for the Return of the Minor Children

1/21/2021: Notice - of Application for the Return of the Minor Children

Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law

1/21/2021: Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law

Application - for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order

1/21/2021: Application - for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order

Miscellaneous - Writ of Habeas Corpus

1/21/2021: Miscellaneous - Writ of Habeas Corpus

Minute Order

3/22/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

3/22/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

4/21/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/23/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/26/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

05/01/2021

DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Not Held - Court's Motion

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2021

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2021

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2021

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
03/22/2021

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2021

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of the Minor Children ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketApplication (for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less