This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2019 at 00:24:48 (UTC).

AASHA EALY VS SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 AASHA EALY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0527

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EALY AASHA

Defendant

SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH WIND

Defendant Attorney

LEE MARGARET JUHYEE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/27/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/27/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

6/27/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • Hearing01/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Hearing01/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Aasha Ealy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Aasha Ealy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aasha Ealy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aasha Ealy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aasha Ealy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH WIND