This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2021 at 01:06:40 (UTC).

AARON POGUE VS JOSHUA WEINSTEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 AARON POGUE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSHUA WEINSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3817

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POGUE AARON

Defendants

PREVIEW MODELS LLC

WEINSTEIN JOSHUA AKA JOSH WEINSTEIN

PREVIEW MODELS L.L.C.

WEINSTEIN JOSHUA AKA JOSH WEINSTEIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAMBORELLI JOHN

TAMBORELLI JOHN V.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/3/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

12/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

1/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire action, with prejudice); Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aaron Pogue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMBORELLI JOHN V. ESQ.