This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2023 at 14:32:31 (UTC).

AARON PATZAN VS CLUDO K. GEORGIADIS

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 AARON PATZAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CLUDO K GEORGIADIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5879

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATZAN AARON

Defendant

GEORGIADIS CLUDO K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBMAN MICHAEL JACOB

Defendant Attorney

HARRIS CHARLES LANE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/10/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

8/10/2022: Complaint

Answer

8/26/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/31/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2024

Hearing08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2024

Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2024

Hearing01/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CLUDO K. GEORGIADIS (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketAnswer; Filed by: CLUDO K. GEORGIADIS (Defendant); As to: AARON PATZAN (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AARON PATZAN (Plaintiff); As to: CLUDO K. GEORGIADIS (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: AARON PATZAN (Plaintiff); As to: CLUDO K. GEORGIADIS (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AARON PATZAN (Plaintiff); As to: CLUDO K. GEORGIADIS (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less