This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:06:51 (UTC).

AARON KHOUBAN VS MARK FRYDMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by AARON KHOUBAN against MARK FRYDMAN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6608

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KHOUBAN AARON

Respondents and Defendants

FRYDMAN MARK

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

FRYDMAN GAYLE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/22/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS MARK FRYDMAN; GAYLE FRYDMAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

6/22/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS MARK FRYDMAN; GAYLE FRYDMAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Notice

5/1/2019: Notice

CoverSheet

3/2/2018: CoverSheet

Summons

3/2/2018: Summons

Complaint

3/2/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel for Plaintiff); Filed by Aaron Khouban (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Mark Frydman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS MARK FRYDMAN; GAYLE FRYDMAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Mark Frydman (Defendant); Gayle Frydman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Aaron Khouban (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Aaron Khouban (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Aaron Khouban (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Aaron Khouban (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696608    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

AARON KHOUBAN,

Plaintiff,

v.

MARK FRYDMAN , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC696608

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE WEST DISTRICT, JUDGE MARK A. YOUNG presiding in DEPT. M of the SANTA MONICA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 18, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court