Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 02:10:30 (UTC).

AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC VS ABEL V. GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 AAA FLAG BANNER MFG CO , INC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5913

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO. INC

Defendant

GARCIA ABEL V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDIN AARON P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/19/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/13/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDIN AARON PAUL