This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2022 at 05:27:04 (UTC).

A & S PARK BOULEVARD, LLC, CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS OVERLAND DIRECT, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 A S PARK BOULEVARD, LLC, CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OVERLAND DIRECT, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HUEY P. COTTON and VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1297

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HUEY P. COTTON

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A & S PARK BOULEVARD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

CARTWRIGHT MICHAEL R. II

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OVERLAND DIRECT INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

METSON PHILIP A.

Defendant Attorneys

WHITTEMORE JOHN

DREYFUSS LAWRENCE JAY

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COST - SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

11/7/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COST - SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COST - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/31/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COST - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Request for Judicial Notice

10/31/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL R. CARTWRIGHT

10/31/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL R. CARTWRIGHT

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RELATING CASES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING DATE

10/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RELATING CASES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Related Case

9/26/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2022

9/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

8/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)

6/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

6/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SANCTION AS TO MELVIN ARANOFF, ESQ. AND MIRMAN, BUBMAN & NAHMIAS, LLC ONLY

5/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SANCTION AS TO MELVIN ARANOFF, ESQ. AND MIRMAN, BUBMAN & NAHMIAS, LLC ONLY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/18/2022

5/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/18/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Substitution of Attorney

5/10/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Disclaimer

4/19/2022: Disclaimer

Objection - OBJECTION TO DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST OF FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/27/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST OF FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOpposition to Motion to Expunge Notice of Pending action and for Attorney Fees and Cost - Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketObjection to the Declarations of Michael R. Cartwright; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketOpposition to Motion to Expunge Notice of Pending action and for Attorney Fees and Cost - Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order Relating cases and setting case management conference hearing date; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Overland Direct, Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); First American Title, a California Corporation (Defendant); Michael R. Cartwright, II (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Overland Direct, Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Michael R. Cartwright, II (Defendant); As to: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Overland Direct, Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Michael R. Cartwright, II (Defendant); As to: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Temporary Restaining Order and order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities;; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Overland Direct, Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); First American Title, a California Corporation (Defendant); Michael R. Cartwright, II (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Overland Direct, Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); First American Title, a California Corporation (Defendant); Michael R. Cartwright, II (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: A & S Park Boulevard, LLC, California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Overland Direct, Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); First American Title, a California Corporation (Defendant); Michael R. Cartwright, II (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A&S Park Boulevard LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant