Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 13:09:30 (UTC).

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO., INC. A CA CORP. VS GILDA COLLINS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE COLLINS TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO , INC A CA CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GILDA COLLINS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE COLLINS TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0763

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO. INC. A CA CORP.

Defendants

GREG NAIMAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE COLLINS TRUST

CA RECYCLING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

GILDA COLLINS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE COLLINS TRUST

VORTMAN EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEAR SHERRY ANNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

1/8/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Settlement

11/7/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Ruling

11/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/6/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/6/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/5/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/30/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Entire Action); Filed by A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc. A CA Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc. A CA Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc. A CA Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc. A CA Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc. A CA Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by A-1 All American Roofing Co., Inc. A CA Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CA RECYCLING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING WEST LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where Collins is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEAR SHERRY ANNE