This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2022 at 16:20:01 (UTC).

99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC VS SO CAL DEVELOPMENT 1, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SO CAL DEVELOPMENT 1, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0897

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC

Defendants

LIN GINNY

SO CAL DEVELOPMENT 1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUONG TIFFANY D.

Defendant Attorneys

BARTLETT CHANDLER OWEN

TRAN ELVIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/4/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/3/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

4/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

2/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Case Management Statement

1/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/20/2022: Answer

Notice of Ruling

4/15/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSE...)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSE...)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Matter Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure to Prosecute) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Matter Should Not Be Dismisse...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by SO CAL DEVELOPMENT 1, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GINNY LIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SO CAL DEVELOPMENT 1, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GINNY LIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARTLETT CHANDLER OWEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN ELVIS