This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 02:30:55 (UTC).

99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC VS RUBY JIN YU JIANG

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RUBY JIN YU JIANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0854

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC

Defendant

JIANG RUBY JIN YU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON ELI A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/20/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/20/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/7/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

12/7/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE); Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 SHOPPING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON ELI A.