This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2019 at 07:27:18 (UTC).

930 N. DOHENY CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNERS VS DOES

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 930 N DOHENY CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNERS filed an Other lawsuit against DOES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

930 N. DOHENY CONDOMINIUMS HOMEOWNERS

Respondent

DOES

Not Classified By Court

BEREZOVSKY SONIA

FREARS FRANCIS

CHENG ANNIE

KIM MICHELLE

SOLOMON JENNIFER

SHAW Y. JESSIE

BENHAMOU FREDERIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWEDELSON DAVID

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MARKER RICHARD ALAN

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR COURT ORDER APPROVING THE AMENDED AND RESTATED CC&RS AND THE AMENDED AND RESTATED BYLAWS

7/10/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR COURT ORDER APPROVING THE AMENDED AND RESTATED CC&RS AND THE AMENDED AND RESTATED BYLAWS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF Y. JESSIE SHAW IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF Y. JESSIE SHAW IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SONIA BEREZOVSKY IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SONIA BEREZOVSKY IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FREDERIQUE BONHAMOU IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FREDERIQUE BONHAMOU IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER SOLOMON IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER SOLOMON IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANNIE CHENG IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANNIE CHENG IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCIS FREARS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCIS FREARS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE: ASSOCIATION'S PETITION) OF 06/21/2019

6/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE: ASSOCIATION'S PETITION) OF 06/21/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE: ASSOCIATION'S PETITION)

6/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE: ASSOCIATION'S PETITION)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC MITCHELL IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC MITCHELL IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE KIM IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE KIM IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SONIA BEREZOVSKY IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SONIA BEREZOVSKY IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ABRAHAM BARHOUM IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ABRAHAM BARHOUM IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JERLYNN BURKS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JERLYNN BURKS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAMIN ZOKA IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAMIN ZOKA IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GORDON BIJELONIC IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GORDON BIJELONIC IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SONIA BEREZOVSKY IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

6/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SONIA BEREZOVSKY IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION

Declaration - (AMENDED)

6/7/2019: Declaration - (AMENDED)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Petition For Court Order Approving The Amended and Restated CC&Rs and the Amended and Restated Bylaws); Filed by 930 N. Doheny Condominiums Homeowners (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing - Other (REAssociation's Petition) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Francis Frears in Opposition to Petition); Filed by Francis Frears (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Y. Jessie Shaw in Opposition to Petition); Filed by Y. Jessie Shaw (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Annie Cheng in Opposition to Petition); Filed by Annie Cheng (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jennifer Solomon in Opposition to Petition); Filed by Jennifer Solomon (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Frederique Bonhamou in Opposition to Petition); Filed by Frederique Benhamou (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other RE: Association's Petition)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing - Other RE: Association's Petition) of 06/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alexandra Samofalova re Proof of Service Pursuant to Ex Parte Order); Filed by 930 N. Doheny Condominiums Homeowners (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Setting Hearing and Issuing Order to Be Served) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing and...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketOrder (Order setting hearing and issuing order to be served on the membership pursuant to civil code of procedure section 4275(b)); Filed by 930 N. Doheny Condominiums Homeowners (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Petitioner's Application for Order Setting Hearing and Issuing Order to Be Served); Filed by 930 N. Doheny Condominiums Homeowners (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 930 N. Doheny Condominiums Homeowners (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Barbara Farley ISO the Verified Petition for Court Order Approving the Amended and Restated CC&Rs and Bylaws); Filed by 930 N. Doheny Condominiums Homeowners (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketPetition (for Court Order Approving the Amended and Restated CC&Rs and the Amended and Restated Bylaws); Filed by 930 N. Doheny Condominiums Homeowners (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKER RICHARD A.