This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2020 at 10:39:20 (UTC).

821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, VS UNLIMITED CONCEPTS & DEVELOPMENT,INC.,

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against UNLIMITED CONCEPTS DEVELOPMENT,INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0209

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Respondent

UNLIMITED CONCEPTS & DEVELOPMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KERNS BENNETT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY - MECHANIC'S LIEN - (...) OF 09/16/2020

9/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY - MECHANIC'S LIEN - (...) OF 09/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY - MECHANIC'S LIEN - (...)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO RELEASE PROPERTY - MECHANIC'S LIEN - (...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/1/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

9/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

9/9/2020: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Hearing on Petition

7/6/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien

6/29/2020: Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Petition (to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien - (Petitioner)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien - (...) of 09/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien - (...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPetition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien; Filed by 821 PEARL INVESTMENTS LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNLIMTED CONCEPTS & DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant