Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 06:24:16 (UTC).

7911 OCEANUS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS THE EVERGREEN ADVANTAGE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 7911 OCEANUS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE EVERGREEN ADVANTAGE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6939

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OHNONA RAQUEL

7911 OCEANUS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GARCIA JOE G.

Defendants

CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE EVERGREEN ADVANTAGE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SAUNDERS GARY

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/1/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE REQUEST OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE REQUEST OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/18/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Related Case

2/23/2021: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service - No Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

1/11/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

12/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/8/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Hearing05/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 11:43 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata re Request of entry of Default); Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring Party Regarding Automatic Extension); Filed by THE EVERGREEN ADVANTAGE, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Pendency of action); Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 7911 Oceanus, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Raquel Ohnona (Plaintiff); Joe G. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7911 OCEANUS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS is a litigant

Latest cases where THE EVERGREEN ADVANTAGE LLC is a litigant