This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 10:33:24 (UTC).

727 OCAMPO, LLC VS WEBSPECTATOR CORPORATION, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 727 OCAMPO, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEBSPECTATOR CORPORATION, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7642

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

727 OCAMPO LLC

Defendants

IBT SA

FUNES RAFAEL

WEBSPECTATOR LDA

WEBSPECTATOR CORPORTION

PARREIRA ANDRE

PARREIRA DULCE

SA IBT

LDA WEBSPECTATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCGILVRAY BRIAN P

MCGILVRAY BRIAN PAUL

FERNANDEZ STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

11/21/2018: Declaration

Declaration

11/21/2018: Declaration

Request for Dismissal

11/21/2018: Request for Dismissal

Order - Dismissal

11/21/2018: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/21/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Judgment

12/7/2018: Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/13/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/13/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for

12/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

12/13/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

6/20/2019: Unknown

Proof of Service by Mail

6/20/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Association of Attorney

6/20/2019: Association of Attorney

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/20/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution

6/27/2019: Writ of Execution

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: (Re Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • at 12:14 PM in Department M; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order Re Entry of Judgment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Entry of Judgment;) of 12/13/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by 727 OCAMPO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less