This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 00:40:36 (UTC).

712 FOOTHILL, LLC VS PINK PARTNERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 712 FOOTHILL, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against PINK PARTNERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0036

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

712 FOOTHILL LLC

Defendants

PINK PARTNERS INC. DBA PINKBERRY LA CANADA

712 Foothill Blvd.

La Canada, CA 91011

GQ FRESH INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBISON WILLIAM CHARLES

ROBISON WILLIAM C

Defendant Attorneys

TABOADA FRANK

TABOADA FRANK JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Trial Brief

12/2/2020: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

12/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Request for Dismissal

12/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE COMMERCIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

10/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE COMMERCIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE & NOTICE OF TRIAL

10/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE & NOTICE OF TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

8/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JURY TRIAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JURY TRIAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL LIMIT...) OF 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL LIMIT...) OF 04/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL LIMIT...)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL LIMIT...)

RETURNED MAIL

4/10/2020: RETURNED MAIL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL, TRIA...)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL, TRIA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL, TRIA...) OF 04/20/2020

4/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER CONTINUING CIVIL, TRIA...) OF 04/20/2020

Substitution of Attorney

4/28/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

2/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR NON-APPEARANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE FOR OSC RE: MSC; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE FOR FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR NON-APPEARANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE FOR OSC RE: MSC; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE FOR FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department D; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Status Conference (re Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 712 Foothill, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department D; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by 712 Foothill, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Trial Setting Conference (Unlawful Detainer) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by 712 Foothill, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (Unlawful Detainer) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Unlawful Detainer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by 712 Foothill, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Pink Partners, Inc.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 712 Foothill, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINK PARTNERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GQ FRESH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBISON WILLIAM CHARLES