This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 14:02:02 (UTC).

601 OFW LP VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 601 OFW LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0428

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

601 OFW LP

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TABATABAI FARZAD

MIYAMOTO RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by 601 OFW LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 601 OFW LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 601 OFW LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 601 OFW LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TABATABAI FARZAD