Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2020 at 22:03:16 (UTC).

5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS TANIA SANUDO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TANIA SANUDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0280

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA BRIARCREST NURSING CENTER

Defendants

SANUDO TANIA AKA TANIA ESCOBEDO AKA TANIA BECERRA AKA TANIA ESCOBEDO AKA TANIA BECERRA

ESCOBEDO MARIA G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALAMOFF ADAM L.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

8/26/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

Case Management Statement

7/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ADAM L. SALAMOFF, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

7/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ADAM L. SALAMOFF, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RAYMOND PELLICER IN SUPPORT OF REQUES TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFA ULT BY COURT

7/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RAYMOND PELLICER IN SUPPORT OF REQUES TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFA ULT BY COURT

Default Judgment

7/30/2020: Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/4/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/7/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/14/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles )); Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ADAM L. SALAMOFF, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT); Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF RAYMOND PELLICER IN SUPPORT OF REQUES TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFA ULT BY COURT); Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5648 EAST GOTHAM STREET LLC DBA BRIARCREST NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salamoff, Adam L