This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:23:59 (UTC).

55 TRADING CORP INC ET AL VS LA WAVE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 55 TRADING CORP INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LA WAVE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7468

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

55 TRADING CORP INC.

IN MODE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

LA WAVE LLC

DIETENHOFER TIM

ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Cross Defendants

KIM YOUNG [DOE XV]

LEE YONG [DOE XIV]

NAM STEVE [DOE XII]

KIM YU

YOON KENNETH [DOE XI]

KANG WON [DOE XIII]

GARCIA JOSE [DOE XVI]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SIMON SOO-KIL CHANG

Defendant Attorney

HEANEY JOHN T.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING FIRST AMENDED DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING FIRST AMENDED DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order

12/14/2017: Minute Order

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, ETC.

1/3/2018: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, ETC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/1/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

2/1/2018: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF LODGING AND LODGING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF LODGING AND LODGING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE, DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED PARTIES AND OTHER ORDERS OF MAY 2, 2017; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THERE OF

2/26/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE, DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED PARTIES AND OTHER ORDERS OF MAY 2, 2017; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THERE OF

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF NOTICE AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

2/27/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF NOTICE AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/20/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/20/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND OTHER ORDERS

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND OTHER ORDERS

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant); Tim Dietenhofer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Default Judg)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant); Tim Dietenhofer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant); Tim Dietenhofer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant); Tim Dietenhofer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant); Tim Dietenhofer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Tim Dietenhofer in Support of Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant); Tim Dietenhofer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT IN MODE TO DEFENDANT LA WAVE'S CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant); Alliance Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Tim Dietenhofer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by La Wave, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT, MONEY DAMAGES, ABUSE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 55 Trading Corp, Inc. (Plaintiff); In Mode, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

13:56 661251! JOHN T HEANEY PAGE 82/12

John T. Heaney, CSB #52464

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN T. HEANEY 18723 Via Princessa, #333

Santa Clarita, CA 91387

Tel. (661) 299-6525

Fax., (661) 251-6618

Attormeys for Defendants and Cross-Complainant

Superior C!)urt of Californi ounty of Los Ange’;grsn'a

DEC 0 1 2017

SBl;em' R. %rter, Executive Officer/Clerk Deputy

Jenny D. Tryong

SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

55 Trading Corp., Inc. dba In Mode, a Califormia Corporation,

Plaintiff,

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO “FIRST AMENDED” DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

(Telephone Appearance)

Assigned for all purposes to The Hon, Malcolm Mackey, Dept. 55

Hearing date: December 14, 2017 Time: 8:30 AM Dept.. 35

Action Filed: January 19, 2017 Trial Date: April 2, 2018

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA Wave, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEANEY JOHN T.