This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 09:04:30 (UTC).

509 ORLANDO, LLC VS A.J. KHAIR CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 509 ORLANDO, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A J KHAIR CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1007

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

509 ORLANDO LLC

Defendant

A.J. KHAIR CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUIDRY RENATA A.

Defendant Attorney

GROSFELD ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/26/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO ENTER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO ENTER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR AND DISCOVERY)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR AND DISCOVERY)

Case Management Statement

4/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION)

Notice of Ruling

4/29/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

10/19/2020: Notice - CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Answer

10/19/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/19/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

8/25/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/30/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Status Conference (ReADR and Discovery) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: ADR and Discovery)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Case Management Order); Filed by A.J. Khair Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER); Filed by A.J. Khair Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO ENTER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER); Filed by A.J. Khair Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by 509 Orlando, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Status Conference (ReMediation) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 509 Orlando, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by A.J. Khair Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by A.J. Khair Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by A.J. Khair Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by 509 Orlando, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 509 Orlando, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 509 Orlando, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 509 Orlando, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.J. KHAIR CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSFELD ROBERT