Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:31:57 (UTC).

501 EAST 51ST ST. LONG BEACH-10, LLC VS LIG INSURANCE SERV

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 501 EAST 51ST ST LONG BEACH-10, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIG INSURANCE SERV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1176

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

501 EAST 51ST STREET LONG BEACH -10.LLC

Defendants

KOOKMIN BEST INSURANCE CO. LTD. +DBA

LIG INSURANCE CO. LTD -SO.KOREAN ENTITY

FLYNN COMMERCIAL INSURANCE SDRVICES INC.

LEADING INSUANCE CO.

DOES 10 - 100

LEADING INSURANCE CO. (U.S. BRANCH )

LIG INSURANCE SERVICES INC. - NJ CORP

LEADING INSURANCE CO. U.S. BRANCH

Not Classified By Court

TAT JENNIFER

DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONAHOO & ASSOC. ( JUDITH CAMILLERI )

DONAHOO RICHARD EARL

Other Attorneys

COOPER KEITH LOREN

 

Court Documents

Declaration

7/30/2018: Declaration

Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Opposition

8/8/2018: Opposition

Objection

8/8/2018: Objection

Proof of Service by Mail

8/8/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Bifurcate

8/9/2018: Motion to Bifurcate

Opposition

8/15/2018: Opposition

Declaration

8/17/2018: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

8/17/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

8/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment

11/15/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

3/18/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Objection

3/25/2019: Objection

Declaration

4/10/2019: Declaration

Order

5/21/2019: Order

Judgment

5/23/2019: Judgment

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order); Filed by KOOKMIN BEST INSURANCE CO., LTD. +DBA (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE CO., LTD -SO.KOREAN ENTITY (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE SERVICES INC. - NJ CORP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment); Filed by KOOKMIN BEST INSURANCE CO., LTD. +DBA (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE CO., LTD -SO.KOREAN ENTITY (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE SERVICES INC. - NJ CORP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketJudgment ([Proposed] Amended Judgment Against Plaintiff 501 East 51st Street, Long Beach - 10, LLC); Filed by KOOKMIN BEST INSURANCE CO., LTD. +DBA (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE CO., LTD -SO.KOREAN ENTITY (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE SERVICES INC. - NJ CORP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Strike or Tax Costs); Filed by KOOKMIN BEST INSURANCE CO., LTD. +DBA (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE CO., LTD -SO.KOREAN ENTITY (Defendant); LIG INSURANCE SERVICES INC. - NJ CORP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Tax Defendants Costs;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketTentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to St...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketReply (TO LIG INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX DEFENDANTS' COSTS); Filed by 501 EAST 51ST STREET LONG BEACH -10.LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of K. Anderson Franco in Opposition to Plaintiff 501); Filed by DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY LLP (KEITH COOPER) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff 501 East 51st Street Motion to Strike and Tax Defendants' Costs); Filed by DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY LLP (KEITH COOPER) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
213 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketAmended Answer; Filed by DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY LLP (KEITH COOPER) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY LLP (KEITH COOPER) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 501 EAST 51ST STREET LONG BEACH -10.LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co. Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where KOOKMIN BEST INSURANCE CO. LTD US BRANCH is a litigant

Latest cases where DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEADING INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant