This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 06:49:06 (UTC).

5007 HOLDINGS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS JUN I YOON, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JUN I. YOON TRUST UDT AUGUST 15, 1994, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 5007 HOLDINGS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JUN I YOON, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JUN I YOON TRUST UDT AUGUST 15, 1994,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6139

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

5007 HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

HANA SMALL BUSINESS LENDING INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

OPEN BANK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

YOON JUN I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWNE DAVID MILTON

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/7/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

 

Docket Entries

06/20/2022

Hearing06/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketSummons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by 5007 Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by 5007 Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 5007 Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 5007 Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by 5007 Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less