This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 15:20:29 (UTC).

NEREIDA ANDRADE VS JAMIE MICHAEL BYRNE

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 NEREIDA ANDRADE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JAMIE MICHAEL BYRNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1911

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDRADE NEREIDA

Respondent

BYRNE JAMIE MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail (proposed judgment and attached forms ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Notice - Rejection (judgment package submitted 7.11.18 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Andrade, Nereida ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less