*******9184
10/09/2020
Disposed - Dismissed
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
JAMES C. CHALFANT
DANIEL S. MURPHY
3RD & CROFT PARTNERS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
KREATION JUICERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
SARSHAR MARJAN
HAKIMI HELGA
NGUYEN LAURA EACH
10/6/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT REGARDING OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND REQUEST FOR HEARING TO BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR
10/26/2021: Order - Dismissal
10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
11/4/2021: Notice of Ruling
8/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKING THE ANSWER OF THE CORPORATI...)
8/12/2021: Notice of Settlement
8/13/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
7/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RENEE MIZRAID IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRIT OF ATTACHMENT TO REFLECT PAYMENTS MADE
7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AGAINST DEFENDA...)
7/13/2021: Order - DECISION ON APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER: DENIED
5/13/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
6/10/2021: Substitution of Attorney
6/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
6/14/2021: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
6/24/2021: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDAN KREATION JUICERY
7/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER
7/8/2021: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
6/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION LIMITED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS COUNSELS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held
[-] Read LessDocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court
[-] Read LessDocketMemorandum (PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT REGARDING OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND REQUEST FOR HEARING TO BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR); Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); KREATION JUICERY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Striking the Answer of the Corporation Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 436) - Held
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 3RD & CROFT PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); 123 LARCHMONT VILLAGE PARTNERS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessCase Number: *******9184 Hearing Date: July 13, 2021 Dept: 85
3rd & Croft Partners, LLC, et al. v. Kreation Juicery, Inc., et al., *******9184
Tentative decision on application for right to attach order: denied
Plaintiff 3rd & Croft, LLC (“Croft”) applies for a right to attach order against Defendant Kreation Juicery, Inc. (“Kreation”) in the amount of $386,269.54.
The court has read and considered the moving papers, opposition,[1] and reply, and renders the following tentative decision.
A. Statement of the Case
1. Complaint
Plaintiffs Croft and Larchmont Village Partners, LCC (“Larchmont”) commenced this action on October 9, 2020 against Defendants Kreation and Marjan Sarshar (“Sarshar”), alleging causes of action for (1) breach of oral contract; (2) common count on an open book account; and (3) breach of guaranty. The Complaint alleges in pertinent part as follows.
On December 3, 2014 Plaintiff Croft and Defendant Kreation entered into a written Commercial Lease Agreement for the lease of the real property located 8426 West 3rd Street, Los Angeles, California 90048 (“8426 Property”) for a term commencing on June 9, 2015 and terminating on June 8, 2025 with a monthly base rent amount in accordance with the rent schedule set forth in the lease agreement plus monthly triple net Common Area Maintenance (“CAM”) expenses (“8426 West 3rd Lease”).
On December 3, 2014 Plaintiff Croft and Defendant Kreation (as “Kreation & 1202 Abbot Kinney Inc.” which since merged into Kreation) entered into a written Commercial Lease Agreement for the lease of the real property located 8428 West 3rd Street, Los Angeles, California 90048 (“8428 Property”) for a term commencing on June 9, 2015 and terminating on June 8, 2025 with a monthly base rent amount in accordance with the rent schedule set forth in the lease agreement plus monthly triple net CAM expenses (“8428 West 3rd Lease”).
On June 8, 2016, Plaintiff Larchmont and Defendant Kreation entered into a written Commercial Lease Agreement for the lease of the real property located 121 North Larchmont Blvd., Los Angeles, California 90004 (“Larchmont Property”) for a term commencing on July 1, 2016 and terminating on October 1, 2026 with a monthly base rent amount in accordance with the rent schedule set forth in the lease agreement plus monthly triple net CAM expenses (“121 North Larchmont Lease”).
On June 13, 2016 Defendant Sarshar executed a written Guaranty of Lease stating that she would be personally liable and responsible to Larchmont for all sums due and owing under the subject 121 North Larchmont Lease (“Guaranty of 121 North Larchmont Lease”).
On April 1, 2020, Defendant Kreation failed to pay the required monthly rent and prorated triple net CAM expenses pursuant to the 8426 West 3rd Lease, 8428 West 3rd Lease, and 121 North Larchmont Lease (collectively, the “Subject Leases”), and continues to refuse and fail to pay Plaintiffs the sums required under the Subject Leases despite Plaintiffs’ demands for payment. There is now due, owing and unpaid the total sum of $215,680.96, calculated through October 31, 2020 ($47,756.83 under the 8426 West 3rd Lease, $111,150.00 under the 8428 West 3rd Lease, and $56,774.13 under the 121 North Larchmont Lease).
On April 1, 2020, Defendant Sarshar failed to pay the required monthly rent and prorated triple net CAM expenses to Plaintiff Larchmont for the Guaranty of 121 North Larchmont Lease. Defendant Sarshar continues to refuse and fail to pay the Guaranty despite Plaintiff’s demand for payment. There is now due, owing and unpaid the sum of $56,774.13 calculated through October 31, 2020.
As required by the Subject Leases, Plaintiffs have made an offer of mediation to Defendants in order to resolve the disputes and claims alleged herein prior to filing this action, but Defendants have refused Plaintiffs’ offer to mediate.
2. Course of Proceedings
According to a proof of service on file, Kreation was served with the Summons and Complaint via substituted service on October 22, 2022. Kreation’s counsel was served with the moving papers for the instant application on May 4, 2021 via electronic mail.
Kreation’s default was entered on December 28, 2020 but was vacated by stipulation on January 29, 2021.
B. Applicable Law
Attachment is a prejudgment remedy providing for the seizure of one or more of the defendant’s assets to aid in the collection of a money demand pending the outcome of the trial of the action. See Whitehouse v. Six Corporation, (1995) 40 Cal.App.4th 527, 533. In 1972, and in a 1977 comprehensive revision, the Legislature enacted attachment legislation (CCP ;481.010 et seq.) that meets the due process requirements set forth in Randone v. Appellate Department, (1971) 5 Cal.3d 536. See Western Steel & Ship Repair v. RMI, (12986) 176 Cal.App.3d 1108, 1115. As the attachment statutes are purely the creation of the Legislature, they are strictly construed. Vershbow v. Reiner, (1991) 231 Cal.App.3d 879, 882.
A writ of attachment may be issued only in an action on a claim or claims for money, each of which is based upon a contract, express or implied, where the total amount of the claim or claims is a fixed or readily ascertainable amount not less than five hundred dollars ($500). CCP ;483.010(a). A claim is “readily ascertainable” where the amount due may be clearly ascertained from the contract and calculated by evidence; the fact that damages are unliquidated is not determinative. CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc. v. Super DVD, Inc., (2004) 115 Cal.App.4th 537, 540-41 (attachment appropriate for claim based on rent calculation for lease of commercial equipment).
All property within California of a corporation, association, or partnership is subject to attachment if there is a method of levy for the property. CCP ;487.010(a), (b). While a trustee is a natural person, a trust is not. Therefore, a trust’s property is subject to attachment on the same basis as a corporation or partnership. Kadison, Pfaelzer, Woodard, Quinn & Rossi v. Wilson, supra, 197 Cal.App.3d at 4.
The plaintiff may apply for a right to attach order by noticing a hearing for the order and serving the defendant with summons and complaint, notice of the application, and supporting papers any time after filing the complaint. CCP ;484.010. Notice of the application must be given pursuant to CCP section 1005, sixteen court days before the hearing. See ibid.
The notice of the application and the application may be made on Judicial Council forms (Optional Forms AT-105, 115). The application must be supported by an affidavit showing that the plaintiff on the facts presented would be entitled to a judgment on the claim upon which the attachment is based. CCP ;484.030.
Where the defendant is a corporation, a general reference to “all corporate property which is subject to attachment pursuant to subdivision (a) of Code of Civil Procedure Section 487.010” is sufficient. CCP ;484.020(e). Where the defendant is a partnership or other unincorporated association, a reference to “all property of the partnership or other unincorporated association which is subject to attachment pursuant to subdivision (b) of Code of Civil Procedure Section 487.010” is sufficient. CCP ;484.020(e). A specific description of property is not required for corporations and partnerships as they generally have no exempt property. Bank of America v. Salinas Nissan, Inc., (“Bank of America”) (1989) 207 Cal.App.3d 260, 268.
A defendant who opposes issuance of the order must file and serve a notice of opposition and supporting affidavit as required by CCP section 484.060 not later than five court days prior to the date set for hearing. CCP ;484.050(e). The notice of opposition may be made on a Judicial Council form (Optional Form AT-155).
The plaintiff may file and serve a reply two court days prior to the date set for the hearing. CCP ;484.060(c).
At the hearing, the court determines whether the plaintiff should receive a right to attach order and whether any property which the plaintiff seeks to attach is exempt from attachment. The defendant may appear the hearing. CCP ;484.050(h). The court generally will evaluate the attachment application based solely on the pleadings and supporting affidavits without taking additional evidence. Bank of America, supra, 207 Cal.App.3d at 273. A verified complaint may be used in lieu of or in addition to an affidavit if it states evidentiary facts. CCP ;482.040. The plaintiff has the burden of proof, and the court is not required to accept as true any affidavit even if it is undisputed. See Bank of America, supra, at 271, 273.
The court may issue a right to attach order (Optional Form AT-120) if the plaintiff shows all of the following: (1) the claim on which the attachment is based is one on which an attachment may be issued (CCP ;484.090(a)(1)); (2) the plaintiff has established the probable validity of the claim (CCP ;484.090(a)(2)); (3) attachment is sought for no purpose other than the recovery on the subject claim (CCP ;484.090(a)(3); and (4) the amount to be secured by the attachment is greater than zero (CCP ;484.090(a)(4)).
A claim has “probable validity” where it is more likely than not that the plaintiff will recover on that claim. CCP ;481.190. In determining this issue, the court must consider the relative merits of the positions of the respective parties. Kemp Bros. Construction, Inc. v. Titan Electric Corp., (2007) 146 Cal.App.4th 1474, 1484. The court does not determine whether the claim is actually valid; that determination will be made at trial and is not affected by the decision on the application for the order. CCP ;484.050(b).
Except in unlawful detainer actions, the amount to be secured by the attachment is the sum of (1) the amount of the defendant’s indebtedness claimed by the plaintiff, and (2) any additional amount included by the court for estimate of costs and any allowable attorneys’ fees under CCP section 482.110. CCP ;483.015(a); Goldstein v. Barak Construction, (2008) 164 Cal.App.4th 845, 852. This amount must be reduced by the sum of (1) the amount of indebtedness that the defendant has in a money judgment against plaintiff, (2) the amount claimed in a cross-complaint or affirmative defense and shown would be subject to attachment against the plaintiff, and (3) the value of any security interest held by the plaintiff in the defendant’s property, together with the amount by which the acts of the plaintiff (or a prior holder of the security interest) have decreased that security interest’s value. CCP ;483.015(b). A defendant claiming that the amount to be secured should be reduced because of a cross-claim or affirmative defense must make a prima facie showing that the claim would result in an attachment against the plaintiff.
Before the issuance of a writ of attachment, the plaintiff is required to file an undertaking to pay the defendant any amount the defendant may recover for any wrongful attachment by the plaintiff in the action. CCP ;489.210. The undertaking ordinarily is $10,000. CCP ;489.220. If the defendant objects, the court may increase the amount of undertaking to the amount determined as the probable recovery for wrongful attachment. CCP ;489.220. The court also has inherent authority to increase the amount of the undertaking sua sponte. North Hollywood Marble Co. v. Superior Court, (1984) 157 Cal.App.3d 683, 691.
C. Statement of Facts
1. Plaintiff’s Evidence
Since December 2014, Defendant Kreation has been a tenant at both the 8426 and 8428 W. 3rd St. locations, operating a successful juice restaurant and cafe, respectively. Mizrahi Decl., ¶2, Exs. A, B. Although both locations have remained open throughout the pandemic and continued to do business and Kreation has received substantial PPP loans, Kreation has failed to pay any rent or related CAM charges on either location since March 2020. Id.
As of May 3, 2021, Kreation has an unpaid balance of $95,988.16 for unpaid rent and CAM charges for the 8426 W. 3rd St. location and $223,423.00 for the 8428 W. 3rd St. location, a total of $319,411.16. Mizrahi Decl., ¶3, Exs. C, D. It is anticipated that Kreation will continue to fail to pay rent and CAM charges for June and July 2021, and therefore at the time of the scheduled hearing there will be a total balance owed for both locations in the sum of $365,269.54. Id.
2. Defendant’s Evidence
Kreation paid both its rent and the Common Area Maintenance ("CAM") as it became due for both units from the inception of the lease until the start of the COVID-19 pandemic. Sarshar Decl., ¶5. Kreation faced severe financial difficulties as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. Sarshar Decl., ¶6. The assets of Kreation are crucial to the payment of compensation to Kreation\'s employees who rely on Kreation for support of themselves and their families. Sarshar Decl., ¶7. Sarshar also relies on Kreation\'s earning for his support. Id.
D. Analysis
Plaintiff Croft applies for a right to attach order against Defendant Kreation in the amount of $386,269.54, which includes estimated costs of $1,000 and estimated attorneys’ fees of $20,000.
1. Procedural Issue
An application for a writ of attachment is a law and motion matter. CRC 3.1103(a). All law and motion matters, with inapplicable exceptions, must be accompanied by a memorandum of points and authorities. CRC 3.1113(a). Croft fails to comply with this requirement, and thereby fails to set forth the law of attachment and any analysis in support of its application. The application must be denied for this reason.
2. Merits
Assuming, arguendo, that Croft’s procedural failure is not fatal to its application, the following analysis applies.
a. A Claim Based on a Contract
Croft’s claim is based on the 8426 West 3rd Lease and the 8428 West 3rd Lease, pursuant to which Kreation leased the 8426 and 8428 Properties. Mizrahi Decl., Exs. A, B. Croft’s claim is based on a contract.
b. An Amount Due That is Fixed and Readily Ascertainable
A claim is “readily ascertainable” where the damages may be readily ascertained by reference to the contract and the basis of the calculation appears to be reasonable and definite. CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc. v. Super DVD, Inc., (2004) 115 Cal.App.4th 537, 540-41. The fact that the damages are unliquidated is not determinative. Id. But the contract must furnish a standard by which the amount may be ascertained and there must be a basis by which the damages can be determined by proof. Id. (citations omitted).
Croft provides the tenant ledgers for the 8426 West 3rd and 8428 West 3rd Leases, which show an amount due and owing of $95,988.16 for unpaid rent and CAM charges for the 8426 W. 3rd St. location and $223,423.00 for the 8428 W. 3rd St. location, for a total of $319,411.16 owed. Mizrahi Decl., Exs. C, D. Croft claims that Kreation’s continued failure to make rent payments will result in a total amount of $365,269.54 by the time of the hearing. Mizrahi Decl., ¶3. Croft fails to provide any calculations supporting this amount. Kreation does not dispute that it has failed to make rental payments in the amounts noted. Croft also claims entitlement to estimated costs in the amount of $1,000 and estimated attorneys’ fees in the amount of $20,000. Croft fails to support these amounts with an attorney declaration, and they are denied.
The amount due is fixed and readily ascertainable in the amount of $319,411.16.
c. Probability of Success
Croft has demonstrated a probability of success on its claim for breach of contract because it is undisputed that Kreation has failed to pay its rental obligations under the 8426 West 3rd Lease and the 8428 West 3rd Lease. Kreation does not dispute its failure to pay its obligations or Croft’s entitlement to payment, instead arguing that Croft’s application must be denied due to the effect of Los Angeles Municipal Code Article 14.6, entitled "Temporary Protection of Tenants During COVID-19 Pandemic," (“Moratorium”), which has been in effect in the City of Los Angeles since March 4, 2020. Opp. at 1-4. Kreation notes that the 8428 and 8426 Properties are commercial real properties that fall under the protections of the moratorium, preventing eviction of tenants from such properties for failure to pay rent. Id., Sarshar Decl., Ex. A.
Kreation’s argument is spurious. As Kreation cite shows, the Moratorium (LAMC ;49.99.3) prevents the eviction of certain commercial tenants during the “local emergency period”; it does not prevent actions for the collection of rent. The opposition’s quoted language that “[t]enants shall have up to three months following the expiration of the Local Emergency Period to repay any rent deferred during the Local Emergency Period” simply means that a tenant cannot be evicted for non-payment of rent during this three month period.
As Croft correctly notes (Reply at 2-3) Kreation fails to cite any authority supporting its claim that an application for a writ of attachment, which is part of a collection action and unrelated to the eviction process, is affected by the Moratorium. The Moratorium specifically states that: “Nothing in this article eliminates any obligation to pay lawfully charged rent.” Sarshar Decl., Ex. A. The Moratorium only prevents Croft from evicting Kreation for its failure to pay rent and nothing precludes Croft from seeking attachment.[2] Reply at 2-3.
Kreation also argues that Croft cannot seek attachment because Kreation’s assets constitute property necessary for the support of individual Defendant Sarshar. Opp. at 4. Croft seeks attachment against Kreation, which is a corporation and not a natural person. Croft does not seek attachment against Sarshar. The fact that an officer of employee of a corporation is dependent upon income from the corporation does not prevent attachment against the corporation. Sarshar also cannot create a corporate entity and then argue that it is really her alter ego. Kreation’s argument is also conclusory and unsupported of any evidence establishing Sarshar’s financial status.
Croft notes that Kreation fails to account for the $3.2 million it received in PPP loans and that Kreation’s own statements indicate it was not heavily affected by the pandemic. Berke Decl., Exs. A, B.
E. Conclusion
The application for a right to attach order is procedurally defective and is denied.
[1] Defendant Kreation failed to lodge a courtesy copy of its opposition brief in violation of the Presiding Judge’s General Order Re: Mandatory Electronic Filing. Its counsel is admonished to provide courtesy copies in all future filings.
[2].