This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 12:29:08 (UTC).

3RD & CRESCENT INVESTORS, A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP VS THU VAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 3RD CRESCENT INVESTORS, A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THU VAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8698

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3RD & CRESCENT INVESTORS A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

NGUYEN JIMMY NGOC

VAN AN INDIVIDUAL THU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/4/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by 3rd & Crescent Investors, a California Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 3rd & Crescent Investors, a California Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 3rd & Crescent Investors, a California Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 3rd & Crescent Investors, a California Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOLNIK FRED M.