This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 08:20:22 (UTC).

EDNA MAYLETH RAMIREZ NORIEGA VS RICARDO SANCHEZ NORIEGA

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 EDNA MAYLETH RAMIREZ NORIEGA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RICARDO SANCHEZ NORIEGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCOY, LARONDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1745

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MCCOY, LARONDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMIREZ NORIEGA EDNA MAYLETH

Respondent

NORIEGA RICARDO SANCHEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 102, McCoy, LaRonda, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - Case Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • 4th Notice Sent/Assignment to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez Noriega, Edna ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez Noriega, Edna ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less