This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:06:17 (UTC).

338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC VS HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9263

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GYORGY CSABA "CHOBI"

DUMONT THIERRY "THEO" J.

HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS LLC

DAVALOS DANIEL K. DBA TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC

DAVALOS DANIEL K. DBA TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIVOLI MICHAEL WARREN

Defendant Attorney

TATONE MICHELANGELO

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WEBER JOSEPH ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS, LLC'S AND THIERRY THEO DUMONT?S FIRST AMENDED CROSS. COMPLAINT FOR: 1. INTENTIONAL MLSREPRESENTATION; 2. NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; 3. PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL; 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/24/2018: HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS, LLC'S AND THIERRY THEO DUMONT?S FIRST AMENDED CROSS. COMPLAINT FOR: 1. INTENTIONAL MLSREPRESENTATION; 2. NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; 3. PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL; 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/21/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

6/26/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS, .LLC'S AND THIERRY "THEO" DUMONT'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/28/2018: PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS, .LLC'S AND THIERRY "THEO" DUMONT'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

7/9/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/10/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIO

8/13/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIO

PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

8/13/2018: PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Proof of Service

8/13/2018: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND REQUEST

8/13/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO THIRD PARTY TRUE VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC. AND REQUEST

Proof of Service

8/21/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

8/21/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

8/21/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

8/21/2018: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS; ETC.

8/21/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS; ETC.

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS; ETC.

8/21/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS; ETC.

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS; ETC.

8/21/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL L. FEDERICI AND ATTACHED EXHIBITS; ETC.

PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (SET ONE) FROM DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT DANIEL K. DAVALOS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANC

8/21/2018: PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (SET ONE) FROM DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT DANIEL K. DAVALOS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANC

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( for an Order Continuing Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT, 338 SOUTH ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling re Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial and Related Dates); Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial); Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael Federici); Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Gilbert Ralph Geilim-Morales, Esq. (Attorney); Daniel K. Davalos (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; (2) COMMON COUNTS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 338 South Avenue 16, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

WEBER FIRMAN

1503 S. Coast Drive, Suite 209 Costa Mesa, California 92626

Tel: (714) 433-7185

Trevor R. Loo, Bar No. 220608

THE LOO FIRM

120 Newport Center Drive Newport Beach, California 92660 Tel: (949) 412-4866

WEBERF IR

Attorneys for Defendant and Cross-Complainant

CSABA “CHOBI” GYORGY MAN PAGE ©2/09

e ——— s e eyt

FILED

Sugerior Court of California ounty of Los Angeles

MAY 07 2018

. Sherri R, Cartefi"?w/e Officer/Clerk y. Deputy n a Zoe Miro

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

338 SOUTH AVENUE 16, LLC, a California limited liability company,

Plaintiff,

HOLLYSHORTS STUDIOS, LLC, A California limited liability company; THEIRRY “THEQ” J. DUMONT, ap

Case No. BC 689263 Assigned for all purposes to; Hon. Michelle Williams Dept. 74

1. PROOF OF SERVICE FOR

individual; CSABA “CHOBI” GYORGY,

an indjvidual; DANIEL K. DAVALOS,

an individual; and DOES 1-20, inclusive,

Defendants,

-1 - CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 338 SOUTH AVENUE 16 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Arthur Weber