This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 05:52:58 (UTC).

JOSE PABLO PEREZJIMENEZ VS DELFINA MENESES HERRERA

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 JOSE PABLO PEREZJIMENEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DELFINA MENESES HERRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1641

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JIMENEZ JOSE JOSE PEREZ

PEREZJIMENEZ JOSE PABLO

JIMENEZ JOSE PABLO PEREZ

Respondent

HERRERA DELFINA MENESES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jimenez, Jose - Granted on 2017-03-21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jimenez, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jimenez, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Jimenez, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less