This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 16:16:12 (UTC).

319 14TH LLC VS T N BUILD STUDIO, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 319 14TH LLC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against T N BUILD STUDIO, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, SAMANTHA JESSNER, DAVID J. COWAN and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8920

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DAVID J. COWAN

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

319 14TH LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

T N BUILD STUDIO INC.

URQUILLA JONATHAN

PAUL BELANGER LANDSCAPE

NAOR TAL

ART DECK INC.

DIAMOND BUILDERS INC.

DESIGN HOUSE GLAZING INC.

PP CONSTRUCTION & REMEDIATION INC.

JOBE ROOFING COMPANY

BELANGER PAUL

ELC BUILDERS INC.

KE GENERAL BUILDING INC.

Cross Defendants, Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

319 14TH LLC

PAUL BELANGER LANDSCAPE

ART DECK INC.

DIAMOND BUILDERS INC.

DESIGN HOUSE GLAZING INC.

PP CONSTRUCTION & REMEDIATION INC.

JOBE ROOFING COMPANY

BELANGER PAUL

KE GENERAL BUILDING INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC

KOHAN JOHN

PP CONSTRUCTION & REMODELING INC.

ROES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

ELC BUILDERS INC. ROE 1 ESA

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL LAURENCE

HALL LAURENCE CHARLES

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CRESPO DANIEL ALFREDO

WORTHE TODD CHRISTOPHER

POIRIER STEPHEN

MULLEN ANDREW

JEFFERY MONA JANE

KAIMAN BARRY

WORTHE TODD

RING BART IVAN

DESALERNOS STEFANIE CHRISTINE

ZUCKER LAWRENCE SI

ZUCKER LAWRENCE S

JACOBS PAUL

GONZALEZ NOELLE D.

HALL LAURENCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Hearing05/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tal Naor (Cross-Complainant); T N Build Studio, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ELC Builders, Inc. (ROE 1) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 319 14th LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 319 14th LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Tal Naor (Cross-Complainant); T N Build Studio, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Unavailability of Counsel); Filed by Art Deck, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Jobe Roofing Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Diamond Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Jobe Roofing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOther - (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address); Filed by Diamond Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Jobe Roofing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer Of PP Construction & Remodeling, Inc. To Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by PP Construction & Remediation INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPP Construction & Remodeling, Inc.'s Demand for Jury Trail and Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by 319 14th LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 319 14th LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 319 14th LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRINGTON CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DIAMOND BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JOBE ROOFING COMPANY is a litigant