This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 18:05:58 (UTC).

SANDRA P CALDERA VS OSCAR CALDERA ACOSTA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 SANDRA P CALDERA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against OSCAR CALDERA ACOSTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4954

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALDERA SANDRA P.

Respondent

ACOSTA OSCAR CALDERA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Caldera, Sandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Caldera, Sandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Caldera, Sandra - Granted on 2017-02-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Caldera, Sandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less