This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:35:23 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. JOSE GEOVANY EVO CHICAS

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against JOSE GEOVANY EVO CHICAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STREIMER, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7182

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STREIMER, LAURA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

EVO CHICAS JOSE GEOVANY

Other and Not Classified By Court

MALDONADO SEYDA MARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • at 9:00 AM in Department 2H, Streimer, Laura, Presiding; DSU - OSC/MTN/RFO Modification Hearing - Not Held - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DSU - Notice of Motion (Modification) (-Child Support (Modified to Zero) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Declaration of Due Diligence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Complaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less