This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 07:26:12 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. FLABIO NARANJO

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against FLABIO NARANJO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HALEVY, LOUISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7172

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HALEVY, LOUISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

NARANJO FLABIO

Other and Not Classified By Court

ASCENCIO NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

Petitioner Attorney

ALEXANDRA BAUER

Respondent Attorney

GRACIA CATALINA LILIANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • at 8:00 AM in Department 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding; DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) - Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Request - Dismissal (Partial, Without Prejudice, As to Minor Child Flabio Naranjo Jr. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Request - Dismissal (REJECTED Item #1 date is missing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) (-Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage ); Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • at 8:00 AM in Department 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding; DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) (-For Judgment, Child Support, Health Care and Parentage ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610) (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Complaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less