This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:35:03 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. GEORGE SIERRA

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against GEORGE SIERRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HALEVY, LOUISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7171

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HALEVY, LOUISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

SIERRA GEORGE

Others and Not Classified By Court

DIAZ NATIVIDAD ELISA

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

Not Classified By Court and Other Attorney

BAUER ALEXANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • at 8:00 AM in Department 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding; DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) - Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Other Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Guideline Calculations/Results

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) (Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage ); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610) (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Complaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less