This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:51:33 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. JARMOR RAYSHAWN PEOPLES

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against JARMOR RAYSHAWN PEOPLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VILLEGAS, ANGELA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7104

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VILLEGAS, ANGELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

PEOPLES JARMOR RAYSHAWN

Others and Not Classified By Court

HUMPHREY JESSICA SHAE

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - No Fee; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • at 8:00 AM in Department 2E, Villegas, Angela, Presiding; DSU - RFO (Initial Hearing) - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Responsive Declaration; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • at 8:00 AM in Department 2E, Villegas, Angela, Presiding; DSU - RFO (Modification Hearing) - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DSU - Request for Order (Initial) (-Set Aside Default/Default Judgment and Allow Leave To Answer-Driver's License Release ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DSU - Request for Order (Change) (-Child Support-Retroactive Modification-Compliance with Local Rule 5.9-Repayment Plan ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Complaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less