This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:47:28 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. KELAP AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against KELAP AGUILAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BLOCK, MITCHELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7101

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BLOCK, MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

AGUILAR KELAP

Other and Not Classified By Court

PELAYO BRENDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Order - After Hearing (9-13-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • at 8:00 AM in Department 2E, Block, Mitchell, Presiding; DSU - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Other Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Other Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Responsive Declaration (Hearing 9-13-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DSU - Request for Order (Change) (Below Interest Repayment Plan ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Stipulation - Entry of Judgment (Non calendar, Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610) (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Complaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less