This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 01:55:10 (UTC).

CHENELLE KASHA SLATER VS RYAN DEAN GRONE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 CHENELLE KASHA SLATER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RYAN DEAN GRONE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8471

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SLATER CHENELLE KASHA

Respondent

GRONE RYAN DEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • Mail - Returned Mail (Conformed copy of Notice of Entry of Judgment & Judgment )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof of Service (Re: Summons and Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 3101, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Application - Publication/Posting of Summons (/Posting - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-16 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Order - Publication (/Posting - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Signed on 2017-05-23 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Application - Publication/Posting of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof of Service (NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Order - Publication (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Signed on 2017-04-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Granted on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Slater, Chenelle - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less