This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:45:41 (UTC).

ROMELIA GUTIERREZ PEREZ VS JACINTO ZARAGOZA PEREZ

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 ROMELIA GUTIERREZ PEREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JACINTO ZARAGOZA PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8470

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUTIERREZ PEREZ ROMELIA

Respondent

ZARAGOZA PEREZ JACINTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S14, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Request - Default Setting; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gutierrez Perez, Romelia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-23 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 05-25-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gutierrez Perez, Romelia - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Notice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gutierrez Perez, Romelia - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less