This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 04:00:23 (UTC).

MARIA TATE VS REGINALD KIETH TATE SR.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 MARIA TATE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against REGINALD KIETH TATE SR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8468

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TATE MARIA

Respondents

TATE REGINALD KIETH

TATE REGINALD KIETH SR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tate, Maria - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tate, Maria - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tate, Maria - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (In whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tate, Maria - Granted on 2017-03-06 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less