This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:26:45 (UTC).

ANGELICA GONZALEZ VS GERARDO ANTONIO GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 ANGELICA GONZALEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GERARDO ANTONIO GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUNA, ANA MARIA and LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8467

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUNA, ANA MARIA

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ ANGELICA

Respondent

GONZALEZ GERARDO ANTONIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S14, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 3101, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Angelica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Angelica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Angelica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Gonzalez, Angelica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less