This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 00:45:17 (UTC).

JULIAN TAFOLLA VS ADELITA TAFOLLA

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 JULIAN TAFOLLA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ADELITA TAFOLLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUNA, ANA MARIA and CHEMELESKI, JOHN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8464

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUNA, ANA MARIA

CHEMELESKI, JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAFOLLA JULIAN

Respondent

TAFOLLA ADELITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • Request - Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S14, Chemeleski, John, Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Transfer - Different Department- This Hearing Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S15, Chemeleski, John, Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Notice - Hearing (Re: Default Prove Up - Notice to:: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Scheduled & Notice Mailed on 2017-04-18 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Request - Default Setting (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Hearing Set on 2017-06-01 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-20-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-09-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Granted on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tafolla, Julian - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less