This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 03:45:38 (UTC).

LESLIE ALANIS VS JOSE ANTONIO ALANIS

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 LESLIE ALANIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOSE ANTONIO ALANIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT and PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8462

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALANIS LESLIE

Respondent

ALANIS JOSE ANTONIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Mail - Returned Mail (Notice of Family Centered Case Resolution Conference mailed to Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 3101, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Mail - Returned Mail (Notice of Status Conference )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Notice Sent to Pet: Alanis, Leslie )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alanis, Leslie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alanis, Leslie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration (of Disclosure ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alanis, Leslie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alanis, Leslie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alanis, Leslie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alanis, Leslie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alanis, Leslie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less