This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 04:31:14 (UTC).

VERONICA RODRIGUEZ VS RAUL RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 VERONICA RODRIGUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAUL RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PACHECO, RANDALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8459

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PACHECO, RANDALL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ VERONICA

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ RAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (re 7/11/17 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Proof of Service - Mail (order after hearing ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Order - Attend Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Notice - Trial Setting Conference; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (REJECT ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Request - Trial Setting; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 03-23-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-23-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice (Case Assignment ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rodriguez, Veronica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rodriguez, Veronica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rodriguez, Veronica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rodriguez, Veronica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Rodriguez, Veronica - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less