This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 13:25:53 (UTC).

TREMAYNE AARON GRANBERRY VS ANGEL CHERRYLL GRANBERRY

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 TREMAYNE AARON GRANBERRY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANGEL CHERRYLL GRANBERRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8458

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRANBERRY TREMAYNE AARON

Respondent

GRANBERRY ANGEL CHERRYLL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-23 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-13-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 04-13-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (In whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne - Granted on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Granberry, Tremayne - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less