This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 02:59:31 (UTC).

JAMIE MARTHA NGUYEN VS QUANG MIHH NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 JAMIE MARTHA NGUYEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against QUANG MIHH NGUYEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8457

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NGUYEN JAMIE MARTHA

Respondent

NGUYEN QUANG MIHH

Others

DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BAUER ALEXANDRA MARTINA

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

ALEXANDRA BAUER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 (Substitution of Payee ); Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Mail - Returned Mail (Minute Order of 11/9/17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S14, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Short Cause Trial - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail (Re: FL-120, FL-311 - On Behalf of: Respondent: Nguyen, Quang - Service Date on 2017-03-21 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 03-30-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Nguyen, Quang - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-23 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • RFO/MTN - Custody, Support and Fees (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nguyen, Jamie - Hearing Set on 2017-04-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nguyen, Jamie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nguyen, Jamie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nguyen, Jamie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nguyen, Jamie - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less