This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:04:37 (UTC).

SREY MOM HOR VS BILL SINARITH KHIEV

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 SREY MOM HOR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BILL SINARITH KHIEV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8456

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOR SREY MOM

Respondent

KHIEV BILL SINARITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 04-13-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (In whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey - Granted on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-30 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hor, Srey - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-03 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less