This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 01:39:45 (UTC).

CARISSA JO WALTERS VS WENDELL PIUS WALTERS

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 CARISSA JO WALTERS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WENDELL PIUS WALTERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5951

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WALTERS CARISSA JO

Respondent

WALTERS WENDELL PIUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name (Restored to Carissa Jo Thompson Snow ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Walters, Carissa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 05-11-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walters, Wendell - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-20 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Walters, Wendell - Service Date on 2017-04-20 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-20-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Response (dissolution of marriage Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Walters, Carissa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Walters, Carissa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Property Declaration (separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Walters, Carissa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (rec# SM459383013 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Walters, Carissa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less